Marshall, John Kenneth (CPSO#: 65428)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Room 2F59
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76782
Fax: (905) 523-6048
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John K. Marshall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yamamura ( CPSO# 65636 )
Dr. J. Marshall ( CPSO# 65428 )

Business Address:
1280 Main Street West
Suite 2F59
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 01 Oct 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN KENNETH MARSHALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSHALL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993