Marshall, Joseph Gilbert (CPSO#: 22908)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Sue Garib Unit 35 - 7000 Bathurst Street Thornhill ON L4J 7Y3 905 881 6510
Instructions: Write or call the above for medical record requests
Date Received: 10 Dec 2013

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1973 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH GILBERT MARSHALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSHALL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2007