Marshall, Lynn Margaret (CPSO#: 20901)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Dec 1969

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 1969

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Environmental Health Clinic
77 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Phone: (416) 351-3764
Fax: (416) 323-6130
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LYNN MARGARET MARSHALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSHALL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Mar 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1969