Marshall, Michelle Theresa (CPSO#: 66769)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Oct 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000 Ext. 3980
Fax: (416) 530-6393
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Marshall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Marshall ( CPSO# 66769 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Health Centre
Room 3L - 232
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE THERESA MARSHALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSHALL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1998