Marshall, Shawn Calder (CPSO#: 62706)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Apr 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Apr 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Rehabilitation Centre
505 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 75590
Fax: (613) 739-6951
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shawn C. Marshall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Marshall ( CPSO# 62706 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Rehabilitation Centre
1200 - 505 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAWN CALDER MARSHALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSHALL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 1997