Marshall, Stephanie Jane (CPSO#: 97955)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Huronia Urgent Care Clinic
480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 792-0933
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marshall & Marshall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Marshall ( CPSO# 97955 )
Dr. L. Marshall ( CPSO# 98995 )

Business Address:
Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Business Address:
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
P.O. Box 4000
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 434-5100

Business Address:
480 Hurontario Road
Suite 102
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 792-0933

Business Address:
166 - 30 Route Ortona Road
Borden ON  L0M 1C0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE JANE MARSHALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSHALL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 29 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2014