Marshall, William John Struthers (CPSO#: 41355)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 14 Mar 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 May 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2001