Martel, Andre Bernard (CPSO#: 105869)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Faculty of Medicine
University of Ottawa
Room 2115, 451 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M5
Phone: 613-562-5420
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDRE BERNARD MARTEL shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MARTEL is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. MARTEL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MARTEL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MARTEL shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MARTEL is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MARTEL no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018