Martel, Guillaume Vincent Dominique (CPSO#: 82707)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Rd
CCW 1667
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Fax: (613) 737-8665
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GUILLAUME VINCENT DOMINIQUE MARTEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011