Martel, Jean-Pierre Albert (CPSO#: 79020)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 25 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2009