Martell, Rafael (CPSO#: 52098)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Brown University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102A
219 Oxford Street West
London ON  N6H 1S5
Phone: (519) 432-3771
Fax: (519) 432-3814
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAFAEL MARTELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2016