Martens, Chandra Gwyn Renee (CPSO#: 70281)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
210 - 1902 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 5B8
Phone: (613) 726-3558 Ext. 21
Fax: (613) 688-0315
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Martens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Martens ( CPSO# 70281 )

Business Address:
4 - 2150 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 9S1
Phone Number: (613) 726-3558

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
USA - Hawaii

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 15 Jul 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHANDRA GWYN RENEE MARTENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTENS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 16 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 21 Sep 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2002 to 14 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2003 to 16 Feb 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 17 Mar 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 15 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1998
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Oct 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1999