Martin, Anne (CPSO#: 64678)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Apr 2004


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 04 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Apr 2004