Martin, Brenda Laila (CPSO#: 65153)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6400 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 3E7
Phone: (905) 821-1406
Electoral District: 05

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENDA LAILA MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993