Martin, Carlos Andrez (CPSO#: 104450)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Guyana, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Jul 2014
PEAP - Resident - General Surgery

McMaster University, 15 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2014