Martin, Claudio Marcelo (CPSO#: 54280)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Room D2 528
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8090
Fax: (519) 685-8649
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Claudio Martin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Martin ( CPSO# 54280 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
Suite D2-528
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAUDIO MARCELO MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1985