Martin, David Charles (CPSO#: 58837)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
93 Ontario Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5J7
Phone: (905) 984-3433
Fax: (905) 984-4421
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David C. Martin, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Martin ( CPSO# 58837 )

Business Address:
102 - 93 Ontario Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5J7
Phone Number: (905) 984-3433

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre St Catharines
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID CHARLES MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1987