Martin, David Hamp (CPSO#: 51040)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Dec 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 205
2289 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7R 2E3
Phone: (905) 632-5864
Fax: (905) 632-2018
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bishop Martin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Martin ( CPSO# 51040 )
Dr. W. Bishop ( CPSO# 50160 )

Business Address:
Peel Children's Centre
85 A Adventura Court
Mississauga ON  L5T 2Y6
Phone Number: (905) 795-3500

Business Address:
Unit 205
2289 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7R 2E3
Phone Number: (905) 632-5864

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 21 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 11 Dec 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 11 Dec 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from December 11, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. David Hamp Martin, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Martin to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                                                of
                                    DR. DAVID HAMP MARTIN
                                          ("Dr. Martin")
                                                to 
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:
                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Martin, certificate of registration number 51040, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Martin, acknowledge that I am currently the subject of College
                  investigations bearing File Numbers 91521 and 7214351 (the
                  "Investigations") into allegations regarding my clinical care and conduct
                  towards patients.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Martin, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it.

            (5)   I, Dr. Martin, undertake that, effective immediately, I will not practise
                  in a hospital setting.

            (6)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Martin, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor"), for twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Martin, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review at least ten (10) of my patient charts at each
                              supervision visit described in Appendix "B" and in paragraph
                              (iii) below;
                  
                        (iii) Weekly visits with direct observation for one-half day for a
                              minimum period of one (1) month following which, upon
                              receiving permission from the College, to transition to
                              meeting with my clinical Supervisor once per month;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at the end of one month
                              of supervision and thereafter at least once every quarter, or
                              more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about
                              my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Martin, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my Undertaking, as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the reports of the
                        medical inspectors dated March 25, 2014, and July 27, 2015, and
                        concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Martin, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Martin, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Martin, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under section (e) above, I
                        will cease practising medicine until such time as I have obtained a
                        Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Martin, agree that if I am required to cease practice as a
                        result of section (f) above this will constitute a term, condition
                        or limitation on my certificate of registration and that term,
                        condition or limitation will be included on the public register.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Martin, undertake that, approximately twelve (12) months
                        after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section
                        (6) above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a
                        Reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                        acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment will include a chart
                        review of a minimum of fifteen (15) patient charts, an interview,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College and as outlined in Appendix "B".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Martin, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking, and to abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the ICR
                        Committee. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Martin, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Martin, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will
                        have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
                        within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
                        regard.  I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR
                        Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination
                        regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are
                        reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute
                        limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will
                        be provided to me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Martin, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section  (d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Martin, hereby consent to the following being included on
                        the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                        conditions or limitations on my practice and/or which the ICR
                        Committee has identified in its decision referenced in section (d)
                        above as terms, conditions or limitations on my practice.
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Martin, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within fifteen (15) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake
                        to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within
                        fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Martin, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Martin, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), and/or any person or institution who may have relevant
                        information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with
                        the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Martin, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Martin, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Martin, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Martin, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (12)  I, Dr. Martin, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Martin, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (14)  I, Dr. Martin, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                  Dr. Martin was the subject of a College investigation into allegations
                  regarding his clinical care and conduct towards patients. As a result of
                  the investigation:
                  
                  *     Dr. Martin will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                        Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months. 
                  
                  *     Dr. Martin's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by
                        the College within 12 months of the end of the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
                  *     Dr. Martin will not practice in a hospital setting.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Martin, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Martin, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the professional education set out in section (6) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors and Assessors, to disclose to the
                  College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or

                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out above and which he or she reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 11, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David Hamp Martin to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 11, 2015:

Dr. Martin was the subject of a College investigation into allegations regarding his clinical care and conduct towards patients. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Martin will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.

Dr. Martin’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 12 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

Dr. Martin will not practice in a hospital setting.