Martin, Deborah Lynn (CPSO#: 57239)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Feb 1988

Summary

Former Name: Drysdale, Deborah Lynn (used until: 09 Sep 1986 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Martin Rejuvenation Centre
Unit B
526 Bryne Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 9P6
Phone: (705) 735-0639
Fax: (705) 721-8437
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.L. Martin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Martin ( CPSO# 57239 )

Business Address:
Martin Rejuvenation Centre
526 Bryne Drive
Unit B
Barrie ON  L4N 9P6
Phone Number: (705) 735-0639

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH LYNN MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 1988