Martin, Edward Stirling Gibson (CPSO#: 68855)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
439 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1N4
Phone: (519) 744-7361
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital
PO Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 744-3311 Ext. 6485
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.S.G. Martin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Martin ( CPSO# 68855 )

Business Address:
439 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1N4
Phone Number: (519) 744-7361

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD STIRLING GIBSON MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2000