Martin, Glynn Robert (CPSO#: 98423)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3
715 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7R1
Phone: (519) 622-2019
Fax: (519) 622-7392
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Glynn Martin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Martin ( CPSO# 98423 )

Business Address:
Unit 3
715 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7R1
Phone Number: (519) 622-2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLYNN ROBERT MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2012 to 29 Jul 2012
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014