Martin, Gregory John (CPSO#: 54767)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
45 Castro St.
San Francisco CA  94114
United States
Phone: (415) 600-6257
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

61 Queen St
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B8
Canada
Phone: (807) 737-1802
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory Martin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 1 2013

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY JOHN MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2011