Martin, Isabelle (CPSO#: 89163)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Mar 2017

Expiry Date:  22 Sep 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Mar 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Bourque, Isabelle (used until: 30 Sep 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Student Health Services
Lambton College
1457 London Road
Sarnia ON  N7S 6K4
Phone: (519) 542-7751
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Martin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Martin ( CPSO# 89033 )
Dr. I. Martin ( CPSO# 89163 )

Business Address:
DMI Professional Building
Suite 113
704 Mara Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 1X4
Phone Number: (519) 344-2949

Business Address:
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 02 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Sep 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Mar 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Isabelle Martin may practise Psychiatry:

                  (i)   at  the  Student  Health  Services  at  Lambton College, in Sarnia,
                        Ontario,  while  under  supervision  coordinated  by  a  supervisor
                        acceptable to the College; and
                  
                  (ii)  only  in accordance with the Retraining  Program  approved  by  the
                        College.
                  
            2.    The certificate  of  registration  automatically  expires eighteen months
                  from the date of issuance.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding  Dr.
                        Martin's  knowledge,  skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to  the  College  by  the  due  date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Martin's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) Dr. Martin is no longer enrolled in the Retraining Program, or
                  
                  (iv)  the College finds the assessment report, pertaining to  the on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Martin's practice unsatisfactory. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  March 23, 2017, and will expire on  or
                  before September 22, 2018, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.