Martin, Jane Elizabeth Logan (CPSO#: 68859)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: Logan, Jane Elizabeth (used until: 18 Aug 1997 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Freeport Health Centre
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 7328
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE ELIZABETH LOGAN MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997