Martin, John David (CPSO#: 20436)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Aug 2001