Martin, Leo Franklin Whitefield (CPSO#: 25762)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 10 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013