Martin, Michael George (CPSO#: 29279)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone: (905) 579-1212 Ext. 256
Fax: (905) 579-2021
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Martin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Martin ( CPSO# 29279 )

Business Address:
Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 579-1212


Corporation Name: M. Martin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 23 2012

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL GEORGE MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1977