Martin, Paul Brubacher (CPSO#: 22122)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1969

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Mar 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 642
32 Collins Drive
Copper Cliff ON  P0M 1N0
Phone: (705) 682-0415
Fax: (705) 682-0415
Electoral District: 08

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 25 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 14 Oct 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 14 Oct 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from October 14, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Paul Brubacher
            Martin, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Martin to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Martin may not prescribe any medication to any person, with the
                  exception of psychoactive medication to patients in his psychotherapy
                  practice. 

            As from 11: 59 p.m., March 25, 2011, by order of the Discipline Committee of
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
            by Dr. Paul Brubacher Martin:

            (a)   Dr. Martin shall not prescribe any drug that is:

                  (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                        the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                        under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food
                        and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27); or
                  (iv)  Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines
                        and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled
                        Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)
                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
                        hereto as Schedule "B")
                  
            (b)   Dr. Martin shall post a sign that is clearly visible upon entering his
                  office(s) in the form set out at Schedule "C".  For further clarity, this
                  sign shall state as follows:  "Dr. Martin is prohibited from prescribing
                  Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                  and Other Targeted Substances."

            (c)   Dr. Martin shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice
                  and patient charts and such other steps as the College may take for the
                  purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of the
                  Order; and

            (d)   Dr Martin shall complete the first available course in Medical Record
                  Keeping for Physicians offered by the College, including the follow-up
                  portion of that course.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 25 Mar 2011
Summary:

On March 25, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Paul Brubacher Martin committed 
an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession in respect of his prescribing of narcotics to fifteen patients. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Martin's 
            Certificate of Registration: 
(a)   Dr. Martin shall not prescribe any drug that is: 
(i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs 
            and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
 
(ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled 
            Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
 
(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, 
            S.C., 1985, c. F-27); or 
 
(iv)  Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and 
      Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19) 
 
(A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of Pharmaceuticals 
and Specialties] is attached to the Order as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are 
attached to the Order as Schedule "B") 
 
(b)   Dr. Martin shall post a sign that is clearly visible upon entering his office(s) in the form 
            set out at Schedule "C" (to the Order).  For further clarity, this sign shall state as 
      follows:   "Dr. Martin is prohibited from prescribing Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic 
      Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances." 
(c)   Dr. Martin shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and patient 
            charts and such other steps as the College may take for the purpose of monitoring 
      and enforcing his compliance with the terms of the Order; and 
(d)   Dr. Martin shall complete the first available course in Medical Record Keeping for 
            Physicians offered by the College, including the follow-up portion of that course. 
 
2.    Dr. Martin pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within thirty (30) days 
            from the date of this Order. 
 
3.    Dr. Martin appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
       

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): March 25, 2011