Martin, Paul Robert (CPSO#: 89033)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
DMI Professional Building
Suite 113
704 Mara Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 1X4
Phone: (519) 344-2949
Fax: (519) 344-7727
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Martin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Martin ( CPSO# 89033 )
Dr. I. Martin ( CPSO# 89163 )

Business Address:
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Business Address:
DMI Professional Building
Suite 113
704 Mara Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 1X4
Phone Number: (519) 344-2949

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL ROBERT MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013