Martin, Rachel Sophia Chow (CPSO#: 83282)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5071
Fax: (416) 864-6014
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Martin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Martin ( CPSO# 83282 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5071

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHEL SOPHIA CHOW MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010