Martin, Rene Francis (CPSO#: 58224)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 1988


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Whitehills Medical Centre
1225 Wonderland Road North
London ON  N6G 2V9
Phone: (519) 472-0040
Fax: (519) 472-7732
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.F. Martin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2007

Dr. R. Martin ( CPSO# 58224 )

Business Address:
Whitehills Medical Centre
1225 Wonderland Road North
London ON  N6G 2V9
Phone Number: (519) 472-0040

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. RENE FRANCIS MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1988