Martin, Robert William (CPSO#: 63658)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 17 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 2006