Martin, Steven Alexander (CPSO#: 58158)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 2005