Martin, Wayne Leonard (CPSO#: 30699)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Windosr Family Health Team Suite 245 2475 McDougall Drive Windsor ON N8X 3N9
Date Received: 01 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 2004 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016