Martinez Gonzalez, Carlos Humberto (CPSO#: 88114)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Instituto De Ciencias De La Salud, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2008 to 24 May 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 25 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Sep 2010
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Sep 2010