Martinez, Lionel Gines (CPSO#: 70956)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jan 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Jul 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Citrus Medical Centre
2240 Lakeshore Blvd W
Toronto ON  M8V 0B1
Phone: (416) 800-6500
Fax: (416) 347-1790
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

101 Medical Centre
101-1520 Steeles Ave W
Vaughan ON  L4K 3B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 597-4457
Fax: (905) 597-4458
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lionel Martinez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 15 2010


Corporation Name: Dr. Lionel Martinez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 2 2017

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Nov 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 15 Jun 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 15 Jun 2011 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 13, 2009, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Lionel Gines
            Martinez, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Martinez
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  I, Dr. Lionel Gines Martinez, have voluntarily relinquished my
                  prescribing privileges with respect to the following drugs, substances
                  and preparations set out in Schedules I through IV of the Controlled
                  Drugs and Substances Act, S.C. 1996, c. 19, as amended, and related
                  regulations (the "Act"), and summarized as follows:
                  
                  Drug/Substance    Relinquished             Not Relinquished
                  
                  Narcotic Drugs          Yes
                  
                  Narcotic Preparations         Yes
                  
                  Controlled Drugs                                 No
                  
                  Benzodiazepines/Other
                  Targeted Substances                              No