Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Martinho, Valdemar (CPSO#: 33196)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 May 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Medecine Familiale
Suite 401
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone: (613) 741-1407
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Val Martinho Medecine Societe Professionnelle / Val Martinho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Martinho ( CPSO# 33196 )

Business Address:
Family Medecine Familiale
401 - 595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone Number: (613) 744-7119

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VALDEMAR MARTINHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTINHO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 1982