Martiniuk Kingdon, Kristianna Louise Conboy (CPSO#: 66530)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
209 Oak Park Blvd
Suite 202
Oakville ON  L6H 0W2
Phone: (905) 845-8771
Fax: (905) 845-8379
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martiniuk Kingdon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Martiniuk Kingdon ( CPSO# 66530 )

Business Address:
209 Oak Park Boulevard
Suite 202
Oakville ON  L6H 0W2
Phone Number: (905) 845-8771

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTIANNA LOUISE CONBOY MARTINIUK KINGDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTINIUK KINGDON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Jul 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1995