Martiniuk, Shauna Olena Conboy (CPSO#: 69205)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Emergency Associates
Room 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5058
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Krishan Rajaratnam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Martiniuk ( CPSO# 69205 )
Dr. K. Rajaratnam ( CPSO# 69242 )

Business Address:
414 Victoria Avenue North
Suite M5
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 526-8430

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAUNA OLENA CONBOY MARTINIUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTINIUK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1997