Martino, Francesco (CPSO#: 60558)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Turin, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 201
366 Main Street North
Brampton ON  L6V 1P8
Phone: (905) 455-1331
Fax: (905) 455-5498
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. F. Martino Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Martino ( CPSO# 60558 )

Business Address:
Queen Square Doctors
201 - 366 Main Street North
Brampton ON  L6V 1P8
Phone Number: (905) 455-1331

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1991 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCESCO MARTINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTINO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1990