Martins Gorrindo, Anahi (CPSO#: 83889)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
368 College Street North
Durham ON  N0G 1R0
Phone: (519) 369-2510
Fax: (519) 369-3831
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martins Gorrindo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Martins Gorrindo ( CPSO# 83889 )

Business Address:
368 College Street North
P O Box 1260
Durham ON  N0G 1R0
Phone Number: (519) 369-2510

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANAHI MARTINS GORRINDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTINS GORRINDO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2006 to 25 Mar 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Mar 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2007