Martins, Rui Fernando (CPSO#: 61147)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
567 College Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1B2
Phone: (416) 538-6653
Fax: (416) 538-9766
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rui Martins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Martins ( CPSO# 61147 )

Business Address:
351 Christie Street
Toronto ON  M6G 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 392-5764

Business Address:
77 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Phone Number: (416) 323-6067

Business Address:
203 - 567 College Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 538-6653

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUI FERNANDO MARTINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTINS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1990