Marton, Monica Elizabeth (CPSO#: 82809)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5713 Dolphin Street
Sechelt BC  V0N 3A0
Phone: (604) 885-2384

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jan 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONICA ELIZABETH MARTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 14 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2017