Martosh, Anita Margaret (CPSO#: 61207)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Mar 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (647) 281-2077
Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Address: Medical records requests should be sent to: The Institute of Sports Medicine Attn: Donna Goldthorpe 230 Browns Line Etobicoke, ON M8W 3T4 Tel: (416) 620-6861
Date Received: 22 Nov 2006

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANITA MARGARET MARTOSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTOSH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 1991