Martyn, Lori Ellen Teressa (CPSO#: 62192)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1991

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Zabrok, Lori Ellen Teressa (used until: 30 Oct 1991 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
481 Cornwall Road
Oakville ON  L6J 4A5
Phone: (289)-430-0115
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Bermuda

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORI ELLEN TERESSA MARTYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTYN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1991

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 13, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)