Marwaha, Gulshan (CPSO#: 80623)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:North Bengal Medical College, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
189 Elm Street Box 2007
St Thomas ON  N5P 3W2
Phone: (519) 631-2030 Ext. 2063
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Taneja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Taneja ( CPSO# 71867 )
Dr. G. Marwaha ( CPSO# 80623 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 2C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 15 Jul 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GULSHAN MARWAHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARWAHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2004 to 28 Jun 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2008