Marwaha, Seema (CPSO#: 89002)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Applied Research Program
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 4466
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 4466
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Seema Marwaha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Marwaha ( CPSO# 89002 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Applied Research Program
6th Floor
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7580

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEEMA MARWAHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARWAHA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012