Marx, Robert (CPSO#: 64169)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Special Surgery
535 East 70th Street
New York NY  10021
United States
Phone: (212) 606-1645
Fax: (212) 774-7822

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 16 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT MARX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARX is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1992