Maryniak, Oleh (CPSO#: 19687)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish, Ukrainian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 28 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 2005