Maryniarczyk, Teresa (CPSO#: 63450)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: Pastuszko-Maryniarczyk, Teresa (used until: 24 Oct 1991 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Uptown Health Centre
Main Floor
243 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4R 1B1
Phone: (416) 489-2106
Fax: (416) 489-2981
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERESA MARYNIARCZYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARYNIARCZYK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993